Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Drug Paraphernalia for Administration – Decriminalization
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the prohibition against a person using or possessing with intent to use drug paraphernalia to inject, ingest, inhale, or otherwise introduce into the human body a controlled dangerous substance; repealing the prohibition against a person delivering or selling, or manufacturing or possessing with intent to deliver or sell drug paraphernalia under certain circumstances; altering a list of certain items that indicate intent to use certain controlled paraphernalia for certain purposes; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0372
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0704 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2021
Legislative Date
1/25/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {578176/1
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {578176/1
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {578176/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {903928/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (19-28)
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-16)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {462512/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-38)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (32-14)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (28-19)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2021
Legislative Date
5/26/2021
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law – Drug Paraphernalia for Administration – Decriminalization
Senate 1/25/2021 1/25/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments {578176/1 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {578176/1 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {578176/1 Adopted 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Floor Amendment {903928/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (19-28) 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Drug Paraphernalia for Administration – Decriminalization
Senate 3/24/2021 3/04/2021 Third Reading Passed (31-16) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Rereferred to Judiciary
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments {462512/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-38) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (32-14) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (28-19) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law – Drug Paraphernalia for Administration – Decriminalization
Post Passage 5/26/2021 5/26/2021 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Last Updated: 5/27/2021 10:41 AM
Click to return on the top page