Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Correcting certain errors or omissions in certain articles of the Annotated Code; clarifying language; correcting certain obsolete references; reorganizing certain sections of the Annotated Code; providing that the Act is not intended to affect any law other than to correct technical errors; and providing for the correction of certain errors and obsolete provisions by the publishers of the Annotated Code.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Annual Corrective Bill
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Annual Corrective Bill
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Annual Corrective Bill
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Annual Corrective Bill
Senate 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Second Reading Passed 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Annual Corrective Bill
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (127-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Text - Chapter - Annual Corrective Bill
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 2:03 PM
Click to return on the top page