Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing certain entities as "quasi-governmental units"; establishing the intent of the General Assembly to weigh certain factors when considering the creation of a new quasi-governmental unit; requiring a board of directors of a quasi-governmental unit to conduct a certain annual performance appraisal of the head of the quasi-governmental unit; requiring a quasi-governmental unit to submit annually a certain budget to the Department of Budget and Management in a certain manner; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0416
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
(   9.6-101 through 9.6-303 )
Last Updated: 3/18/2022 1:01 PM
Click to return on the top page