Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy - Annual Report and Data Dashboard (The Judicial Transparency Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Ferguson, Gallion, Hayes, Hershey, Hester, Hough, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a certain annual report by the State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy to identify certain information for crimes of violence; and requiring the Commission to conspicuously post the required information to be included in the report in a data dashboard on its public website.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0412
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703421/1
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Committee Amendments #1 and #2 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Committee Amendment #3 Adopted (28-17)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy - Plea Agreements and Annual Report (The Judicial Transparency Act of 2022)
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Favorable with Amendments {703421/1 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Committee Amendments #1 and #2 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Committee Amendment #3 Adopted (28-17) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy - Annual Report and Data Dashboard (The Judicial Transparency Act of 2022)
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Referred Judiciary 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/23/2022 11:36 AM
Click to return on the top page