Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Accountability Act Revisions and Clarifications
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that a certain disciplinary matrix applies to all complaints of police misconduct; specifying that the purpose of a certain trial board process is to adjudicate all internal and external matters for which a police officer is subject to disciplin; requiring a trial board for a statewide or bicounty law enforcement agency, within 45 days of a final hearing, to issue a written decision reflecting the findings, conclusions, and recommendations of a majority of the trial board; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0608 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022, October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743429/1
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Kramer) Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743429/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments {743429/1 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Kramer) Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments {743429/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Maryland Police Accountability Act Revisions and Clarifications
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (37-9) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Hearing 4/08 at 9:30 a.m.
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Hearing canceled
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 4/7/2022 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page