Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Marriage Records - Name Change
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (104-27)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing certain procedures for the issuance of a new marriage record when the name of a party to the marriage has been changed.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0369
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Marriage Records - Name Change
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Marriage Records - Name Change
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {283121/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-27)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Marriage Records - Name Change
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Marriage Records - Name Change
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Judiciary 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2022 4/03/2022 Hearing canceled
House 4/03/2022 4/03/2022 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m.
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {283121/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (104-27) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
(   2-504 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:54 PM
Click to return on the top page