Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Sealant Products - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after October 1, 2023, a person from supplying, selling, or offering for sale a high-PAH sealant product for application to a driveway or parking area in the State; prohibiting on or after October 1, 2023, a person from applying or soliciting the application of a high-PAH sealant product to a driveway or parking area in the State; establishing a civil penalty of up to $2,500 for each violation and an administrative penalty of up to $2,500 for each violation, but not exceeding $100,000 total; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0133
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983126/1
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Salling) Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983126/1
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Salling) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {203924/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {463223/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation Economic Matters
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-41)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Environment – Coal Tar Sealant Products – Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2022)
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {983126/1 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Salling) Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Favorable with Amendments {983126/1 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Salling) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {983126/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Floor Amendment {203924/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (15-30) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Floor Amendment {463223/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (15-30) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - Sealant Products - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2022)
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 40AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation Economic Matters 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (93-41) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710
Text - Chapter - Environment - Sealant Products - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2022)
(   9-2401 through 9-2405, 9-320   )
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:25 PM
Click to return on the top page