Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing provisions relating to obtaining a criminal history records check in Carroll County; and authorizing the Department of Human Resources in Carroll County to request, after the submission of two complete sets of the employee's or volunteer's fingerprints and certain fees, from the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository a State and national criminal history records check for a prospective county employee or volunteer who will be assigned to a certain position.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0728
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {173229/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Carroll County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Second Reading Passed 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Carroll County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Senate 2/24/2022 2/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments {173229/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Carroll County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:54 PM
Click to return on the top page