Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Maryland Earned Income Tax Credit Assistance Program for Low-Income Families
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Earned Income Tax Credit Assistance Program for Low-Income Families to identify residents who are eligible to claim the Maryland earned income tax credit but have failed to do so and to provide these residents with a streamlined method to claim the credit; requiring the Comptroller, for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2024, to provide certain forms to eligible residents to claim the credit; requiring the Comptroller to provide certain notice to eligible residents concerning the Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0252
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723521/1
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723521/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {853622/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-31)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax – Return Preparation Assistance Program for Low–Income Families
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {723521/1 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {723521/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Maryland Earned Income Tax Credit Assistance Program for Low-Income Families
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Ways and Means 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable with Amendments {853622/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (101-31) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax - Maryland Earned Income Tax Credit Assistance Program for Low-Income Families
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Maryland Earned Income Tax Credit Assistance Program for Low-Income Families
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:57 AM
Click to return on the top page