Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Patuxent River Commission - Membership
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Patterson, and Jackson
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the membership of the Patuxent River Commission to 36 voting members, one of which must represent an organization or unit of local government engaged in watershed management and restoration, and adding the Patuxent Riverkeeper and the President of the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science or a designee.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0716
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Patuxent River Commission - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {893727/1
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {893727/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {253528/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Patuxent River Commission - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Patuxent River Commission - Membership
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Favorable with Amendments {893727/1 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {893727/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Floor Amendment {253528/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-31) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Patuxent River Commission - Membership
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/16/2022 9:38 AM
Click to return on the top page