Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public–Private Partnerships – Process and Oversight
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Public-Private Partnership Oversight Review Board; requiring a certain reporting agency to include in presolicitation reports for public-private partnerships with a total value that exceeds $500,000,000 presolicitation reports of certain contracts and a certain environmental impact statement under certain circumstances; requiring certain agreements to be submitted to the Legislative Policy Committee; prohibiting the Board of Public Works, under certain circumstances, from designating a public-private partnership; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0485
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1424 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public–Private Partnerships – Process and Oversight
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Public–Private Partnerships – Process and Oversight
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:12 PM
Click to return on the top page