Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government – Notaries Public – Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Notary Public Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying that the purpose of the Fund is to provide funding to support the Secretary of State in the implementation, regulation, and enforcement of certain actions; requiring the Secretary of State to administer the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Secretary of State to distribute certain fees to the Fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0661 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Government – Notaries Public – Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government – Notaries Public – Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:05 AM
Click to return on the top page