Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Adult Protective Services - Workgroup to Study Best Practices for a Vulnerable Adult Registry in Maryland
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Patterson, Elfreth, Klausmeier, King, Sydnor, Beidle, Young, Griffith, Watson, Lee, and Jackson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Workgroup to Study Best Practices for a Vulnerable Adult Registry in Maryland; providing that the purpose of the Workgroup is to identify the appropriate State agency to operate a vulnerable adult registry, identify how a $1,400,000 grant from the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services was allocated and used, if awarded, and study and make recommendations regarding any changes or improvements to State law; and requiring a report of the Workgroup's recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by June 1, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0589
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0844 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {363126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543425/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {363126/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Adult Protective Services - Workgroup to Study Best Practices for a Vulnerable Adult Registry in Maryland
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Judiciary 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {543425/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Adult Protective Services - Workgroup to Study Best Practices for a Vulnerable Adult Registry in Maryland
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Text - Chapter - Adult Protective Services - Workgroup to Study Best Practices for a Vulnerable Adult Registry in Maryland
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:21 AM
Click to return on the top page