Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Intended Use Plans and Privately Owned Wastewater Facilities
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth and Pinsky
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to provide a certain intended use plan to the General Assembly within 5 days of the plan's publication for public comment; altering the definition of "privately owned wastewater facility" as it relates to the awarding of grants from the Bay Restoration Fund; requiring the Department to report on or provide certain information regarding funding for privately owned wastewater facilities to the General Assembly and the Department of Budget and Management; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0714
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {813921/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {393724/1 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653222/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {153127/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (43-93)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate Stein) Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {203124/1 (Delegate Stein) Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {713329/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (39-93)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Bay Restoration Fund - Intended Use Plans and Privately Owned Wastewater Facilities
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2022 2/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {813921/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2022 2/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Kagan) Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Floor Amendment {393724/1 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Bay Restoration Fund - Intended Use Plans and Privately Owned Wastewater Facilities
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments {653222/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Floor Amendment {153127/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (43-93) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate Stein) Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Floor Amendment {203124/1 (Delegate Stein) Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Floor Amendment {713329/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (39-93) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Bay Restoration Fund - Intended Use Plans and Privately Owned Wastewater Facilities
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Text - Chapter - Bay Restoration Fund - Intended Use Plans and Privately Owned Wastewater Facilities
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:11 PM
Click to return on the top page