Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the procedures for the canvassing of absentee and provisional ballots; requiring the State Board of Elections to adopt regulations requiring a local board to notify a voter of a problem with a ballot envelope and provide the voter an opportunity to correct the problem in order to have the ballot counted; and requiring the regulations to allow a voter to supply a certain signature and to choose among multiple methods of communicating with the local board to correct a problem on a ballot envelope.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 3/7/2022 4:59 PM
Click to return on the top page