Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County – Property Tax – Credit for Homeowners Who Have Suffered a Hardship
Sponsored by
Senators Hettleman, Kelley, Sydnor, Salling, and Lam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Baltimore County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on a dwelling that is owned by a homeowner whose combined gross income exceeds $60,000 if the homeowner demonstrates certain criteria, including that the homeowner or a member of the homeowner's immediate family suffered a hardship related to an illness or accident-related injury or a property casualty event at the homeowner's dwelling.
Committees
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0302
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803321/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Baltimore County – Property Tax – Credit for Homeowners Who Have Suffered a Hardship
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {803321/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore County – Property Tax – Credit for Homeowners Who Have Suffered a Hardship
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Ways and Means 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/30/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Text - Chapter - Baltimore County – Property Tax – Credit for Homeowners Who Have Suffered a Hardship
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 2:02 PM
Click to return on the top page