Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Information Technology - Review of Projects and Proposals
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Information Technology)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the information technology proposals of which a unit of State government is required to advise the Secretary of Information Technology to include those involving the sale, lease, exchange, or other disposition of communications sites, communications facilities, or communications frequencies for certain purposes; altering the dollar value threshold from $100,000 to $200,000 of certain information technology proposals that triggers the requirement that the proposal be subject to approval by the Board of Public Works; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/09/2020
Legislative Date
10/09/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/09/2020 10/09/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Government - Information Technology - Review of Projects and Proposals
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable Adopted 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Second Reading Passed 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Information Technology - Review of Projects and Proposals
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 7 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 8 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:12 PM
Click to return on the top page