Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - St. Mary's College of Maryland - Cost-of-Living Adjustment
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the percentage of the cost-of-living adjustment provided to State-supported employees of St. Mary's College of Maryland from 50% to 100% for the fiscal years in which the State provides a cost-of-living adjustment for State employees.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0054
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0609 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Higher Education - St. Mary's College of Maryland - Cost-of-Living Adjustment
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - St. Mary's College of Maryland - Cost-of-Living Adjustment
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Referred Appropriations 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2022 3/13/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:53 PM
Click to return on the top page