Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance - For-Profit Substance Abuse and Mental Health Treatment Providers - Disclosure of Contributions
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "contract" for purposes of certain provisions of law requiring disclosure of campaign contributions by persons doing public business to include a certain Medicaid reimbursement contract with a for-profit substance abuse and mental health treatment provider; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/30/2020
Legislative Date
8/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/30/2020 8/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Campaign Finance - For-Profit Substance Abuse and Mental Health Treatment Providers - Disclosure of Contributions
Senate 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:12 PM
Click to return on the top page