Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Credit for the Purchase and Installation of Indoor Air Quality Equipment
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing individuals to claim a credit against the State income tax for 50% of the costs incurred during the taxable year to purchase and install certain indoor air quality equipment in a home or commercial building; requiring an individual to obtain a certain eligibility certificate from the Maryland Energy Administration in order to claim the credit; providing that the tax credit may not exceed a certain amount and may not be carried over to any other taxable year; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/27/2020
Legislative Date
10/27/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/27/2020 10/27/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax – Credit for the Purchase and Installation of Indoor Air Quality Equipment
(   10-751 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:12 PM
Click to return on the top page