Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Visual Surveillance With Prurient Intent - Private Place and Minor Victim
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from conducting visual surveillance with prurient intent of an individual located in a residence or place of private use or accommodation without the consent of the individual; altering the penalties for the crime of visual surveillance with prurient intent by use of a camera if the victim was a minor at the time of the offense and the offender is at least 4 years older than the victim; and providing penalties for a violation of the Act of imprisonment of up to 5 years or a fine of $2,500 or both.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0185
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Visual Surveillance With Prurient Intent - Minor Victim
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {833924/1 Adopted
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Visual Surveillance With Prurient Intent - Minor Victim
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {833924/1 Adopted 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Visual Surveillance With Prurient Intent - Private Place and Minor Victim
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 2:59 PM
Click to return on the top page