Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Hough
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Sports Wagering Application Review Commission from awarding a sports wagering license to a facility located within a 10-mile radius of certain designated Class B-1 or B-2 sports wagering facilities located in Calvert County, Carroll County, Charles County, or Frederick County.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0339
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {773022/1
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {773022/1
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {773022/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {773022/1 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments {773022/1 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Senator Young) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments {773022/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Ways and Means 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/5/2022 4:54 PM
Click to return on the top page