Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Human Services - Electric Universal Service Program - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Senators Washington and Augustine
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Services to authorize benefits under the electric universal service program for an electric customer who does not meet the eligibility requirements for the federal Low Income Home Energy Assistance Program and has an annual income at or below 175% of the federal poverty level if the customer is under the age of 67 years, or at or below 200% of the federal poverty level if the customer is at least 67 years old.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0138
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/12/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {913823/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Department of Human Services - Electric Universal Service Program - Eligibility
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/15/2022 2/12/2022 Favorable with Amendments {913823/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2022 2/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Human Services - Electric Universal Service Program - Eligibility
Senate 2/17/2022 2/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Referred Economic Matters 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/25/2022 8:07 AM
Click to return on the top page