Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a local board of elections to obtain input from large residential institutional communities including institutions of higher education, continuing care retirement communities, senior communities, and military installations when establishing precinct boundaries and designating polling places; establishing a process for certain voters to submit a federal post card application electronically, which may allow the use of a common access card only for verification of identity and fulfillment of the signature requirement; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0156
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/30/2020
Legislative Date
9/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {194234/1
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {194234/1
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {194234/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {713723/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {643720/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-30)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {475261/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-28)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/30/2020 9/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act
Senate 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {194234/1 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments {194234/1 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {194234/1 Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Floor Amendment {713723/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Floor Amendment {643720/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-30) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Ways and Means 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {475261/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (107-28) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act
Last Updated: 5/10/2021 11:35 AM
Click to return on the top page