Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Somerset County - Elections - County Commissioners Districts and Board of Education Candidate Filings
Sponsored by
Senator Carozza
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing new boundaries for the county commissioner districts in Somerset County; providing for the reopening of the candidate filing deadline for a candidate for the office of member of the Somerset County Board of Education who will be elected at the 2022 general election; and prohibiting an individual who files for the office of member of the Somerset County Board of Education from withdrawing the candidacy.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0289
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
First Reading Reapportionment and Redistricting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 First Reading Reapportionment and Redistricting
Text - First - Somerset County - Elections - County Commissioners Districts and Board of Education Candidate Filings
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 11:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Reapportionment and Redistricting Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/18/2022 Favorable Report by Reapportionment and Redistricting
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Somerset County - Elections - County Commissioners Districts and Board of Education Candidate Filings
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Text - Chapter - Somerset County - Elections - County Commissioners Districts and Board of Education Candidate Filings
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:28 AM
Click to return on the top page