Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pesticide Regulation - Transfer to Department of the Environment
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Transferring the regulation of pesticides, plant diseases, and mosquitos in the State from the Department of Agriculture to the Department of the Environment.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0387
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pesticide Regulation - Transfer to Department of the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Pesticide Regulation - Transfer to Department of the Environment
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
(   18-101, 18-101 through 18-114, 18-103, 18-107, 18-109, 18-110, 18-111, 18-201 through 18-219, 18-204, 18-206, 18-217, 18-301, 18-301 through 18-305, 18-401 through 18-413, 18-405, 18-408, 18-412, 18-501 through 18-509, 18-508, 18-509 )
Last Updated: 2/14/2022 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page