Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Probation Before Judgment – Probation Agreements – Probation Not Deportation
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Ferguson, and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to stay the entering of judgment, defer further proceedings, and place a certain defendant on probation subject to reasonable conditions if the court finds facts justifying a finding of guilt; authorizing the court and a certain defendant to enter into a probation agreement before the defendant enters a plea of guilty or nolo contendere or the court finds facts justifying a finding of guilt under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0559
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683027/1
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Probation Before Judgment – Probation Agreements – Probation Not Deportation
Senate 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments {683027/1 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/11/2022 4:12 PM
Click to return on the top page