Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Property Taxes
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, McCray, Hershey, Kramer, Augustine, and Feldman
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting from personal property taxes a community solar energy generating system that provides at least 50% of the energy it produces to low- or moderate-income customers at a cost that is at least 20% less than the amount charged by the electric company that serves the area where the system is located and is installed on a rooftop, parking facility canopy, or brownfield; prohibiting the supervisor of a county or a municipal corporation from accepting applications for the exemption after December 31, 2024; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0076
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {323123/1
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {323123/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Energy and Property Taxes
Senate 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {323123/1 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments {323123/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Property Taxes
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Referred Ways and Means 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2022 2:43 PM
Click to return on the top page