Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Transportation - Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds - Calculation of Debt Limit
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the maximum amount of debt secured by future federal aid that the Department of Transportation may issue; providing that the maximum amount of debt that may be issued is calculated as of June 30 of any year; and providing that the proceeds from the issuance of certain debt may be used only for certain purposes.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {969632/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {404364/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {183723/1 (Delegate Clark) Rejected (38-90)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-9)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators McCray, Peters and Edwards)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators McCray, Peters and Edwards)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Korman, J. Lewis and Beitzel)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Korman, J. Lewis and Beitzel)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Department of Transportation - Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds - Calculation of Debt Limit
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {969632/1 Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Transportation - Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds - Calculation of Debt Limit
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Appropriations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {404364/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Floor Amendment {183723/1 (Delegate Clark) Rejected (38-90) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (121-9) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators McCray, Peters and Edwards) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators McCray, Peters and Edwards) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 House Refuses Recede 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Korman, J. Lewis and Beitzel) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 House Refuses Recede 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Korman, J. Lewis and Beitzel) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 1:39 PM
Click to return on the top page