Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Estate Investment Trust Modernization Act
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a real estate investment trust to establish its name in a certain manner and have an office in this State and a resident agent; providing for the formation, organization, registration, operation, and termination of foreign real estate investment trusts; requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to register a foreign real estate investment trust in a certain manner; authorizing, under certain circumstances, a foreign real estate investment trust to do business in this State; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Estate Investment Trust Modernization Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Real Estate Investment Trust Modernization Act
Senate 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:51 PM
Click to return on the top page