Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission – Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the date, from September 1 to November 1 of each year, by which the Public Service Commission must submit a report on the status of a certain net metering program; and repealing a reporting requirement on customer education about competitive electricity supply.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0341
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Service Commission – Reporting Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/12/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Service Commission – Reporting Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Service Commission – Reporting Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Service Commission – Reporting Requirements
Senate 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/15/2022 2/12/2022 Favorable Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2022 2/12/2022 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Service Commission – Reporting Requirements
Senate 2/17/2022 2/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Referred Economic Matters 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Text - Chapter - Public Service Commission – Reporting Requirements
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:57 PM
Click to return on the top page