Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel Management System – Office of the Public Defender – Placement and Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle, Benson, Carter, Feldman, Hettleman, Klausmeier, Kramer, Waldstreicher, and Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that, within the Office of the Public Defender, the deputy public defender, district public defenders, and assistant public defenders are placed in certain employment categories in the State Personnel Management System; altering certain provisions of law regarding personnel actions within the Office that relate to the hiring, discipline, and termination of employees; providing that employees of the Office are subject to collective bargaining under the State Personnel Management System; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0090
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0757 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513823/1
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513823/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {203621/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (14-28)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-14)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Personnel Management System – Office of the Public Defender – Placement and Collective Bargaining
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments {513823/1 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {513823/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Floor Amendment {203621/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (14-28) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Personnel Management System – Office of the Public Defender – Placement and Collective Bargaining
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (30-14) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Appropriations 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2022 3/13/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:51 PM
Click to return on the top page