Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Senatorial Scholarships - Program Accreditation
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing each Senator to award not more than 10% of funds available under the Senatorial Scholarship Program to applicants planning to attend certain accredited institutions outside the State, provided that the applicant will be studying in an academic area that is not offered in an accredited program in any institution in the State.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/28/2020
Legislative Date
7/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - Senatorial Scholarships - Program Accreditation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education - Senatorial Scholarships - Program Accreditation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/28/2020 7/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - Senatorial Scholarships - Program Accreditation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable Adopted 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Second Reading Passed 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Senatorial Scholarships - Program Accreditation
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Appropriations 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing canceled
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Hearing 4/07 at 1:30 p.m.
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Hearing canceled
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Hearing canceled
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 12:14 PM
Click to return on the top page