Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Secretary of Health – Professional Qualification Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Feldman)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health to be professionally qualified through experience or education in health law or policy, health care facilities administration, health economics or financial management, government operations related to health care, or as a health care provider.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0287
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Secretary of Health – Professional Qualification Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2022
Legislative Date
1/18/2022
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {523224/1
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {523224/1
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/24 (Senator Griffith) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Secretary of Health – Professional Qualification Requirement
Senate 1/18/2022 1/18/2022 Reassigned to Finance 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments {523224/1 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2022 2/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments {523224/1 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2022 2/18/2022 Committee Amendment Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2022 2/18/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/24 (Senator Griffith) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2022 2/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2022 2/19/2022 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Feldman) Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/24/2022 10:46 AM
Click to return on the top page