Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - System for Newborn Screening - Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey, Beidle, Benson, and Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the newborn screening program in the Maryland Department of Health to require testing for each condition listed by the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services' Recommended Uniform Screening Panel, subject to the approval of the State Advisory Council on Hereditary and Congenital Disorders and the Secretary of Health; and establishing certain requirements related to the approval or disapproval of the inclusion of a condition and the implementation of testing for a condition in the system for newborn screening.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0109
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/12/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {913920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {503022/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-2)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - System for Newborn Screening - Requirements
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/15/2022 2/12/2022 Favorable with Amendments {913920/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2022 2/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - System for Newborn Screening - Requirements
Senate 2/17/2022 2/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {503022/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-2) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Department of Health - System for Newborn Screening - Requirements
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Health - System for Newborn Screening - Requirements
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 2:04 PM
Click to return on the top page