Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Curriculum - Unit of Instruction on September 11, 2001, Terrorist Attacks
Sponsored by
Senator Salling
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring public schools and nonpublic schools that participate in State-funded education programs to include in the curriculum, beginning in the 2023-2024 school year, a unit of instruction on the September 11, 2001, terrorist attacks that is consistent with certain guidelines developed by the State Board of Education; and encouraging nonpublic schools that do not participate in State-funded education programs to include in the curriculum a unit of instruction on the September 11, 2001, terrorist attacks.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Curriculum - Unit of Instruction on September 11, 2001, Terrorist Attacks
Senate 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
(   7-129 )
Last Updated: 2/4/2022 3:46 PM
Click to return on the top page