Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Reports and Records
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Services)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the circumstances under which a report or record concerning child abuse or neglect may be disclosed to certain school personnel or to a director of a licensed child care facility or licensed child placement agency.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2021
Legislative Date
10/05/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Reports and Records
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Reports and Records
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/05/2021 10/05/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Reports and Records
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Reports and Records
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Referred Judiciary 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2022 10:25 AM
Click to return on the top page