Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officer - Employment - Age Requirement
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Public Safety and Correctional Services)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, from 21 to 19, the minimum age requirement for employment as a correctional officer in any unit of the Division of Correction, any unit of the Division of Pretrial Detention and Services, or the Patuxent Institution within the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0044 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/21/2021
Legislative Date
9/21/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Officer - Employment - Age Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/21/2021 9/21/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Correctional Officer - Employment - Age Requirement
Senate 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Age
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:50 PM
Click to return on the top page