Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Services - Coverage
Sponsored by
Senators Ellis and Lam
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a provider to meet certain requirements, maintain up-to-date certification as required by the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, and hold adequate liability insurance in order to provide doula services in the Program; and requiring the Program to cover certain doula services.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0765
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0163 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633327/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Services - Coverage
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-15)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-8)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Program
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {633327/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Services - Coverage
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Senator King) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (30-15) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (116-8) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
(   15-141.3 )
Last Updated: 4/8/2022 2:57 PM
Click to return on the top page