Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Transcript Requests by Students With Unpaid Student Account Balances
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a public institution of higher education to allow a student with an unpaid balance on a student account of $1,000 or less to request and receive a transcript; and requiring a public institution of higher education to allow a student with an unpaid balance on a student account that is greater than $1,000 to request and receive a transcript if the student enters into an installment agreement within 90 days of making the transcript request.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {483825/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Kramer) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Institutions of Higher Education - Transcripts - Prohibition on Punitive Measures Related to Student Debt
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {483825/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Transcript Requests by Students With Unpaid Student Account Balances
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Kramer) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Referred Appropriations 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2022 3/13/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 3:00 p.m.
(   15-134 )
Last Updated: 3/31/2022 3:02 PM
Click to return on the top page