Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Higher Education Students With Chronic Health Conditions
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Higher Education Students With Chronic Health Conditions to study existing data on undergraduate and graduate students with chronic health conditions at institutions of higher education in the State; authorizing the Task Force to use State, federal, and academic resources to carry out its functions; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations on meeting the needs of students with chronic health conditions to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0059
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1457 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/14/2020
Legislative Date
10/14/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force on Higher Education Students With Chronic Health Conditions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/14/2020 10/14/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Task Force on Higher Education Students With Chronic Health Conditions
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:52 PM
Click to return on the top page