Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Semipublic Pools - Lifeguards
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring an owner of an outdoor semipublic pool to ensure that, from Memorial Day to Labor Day, during hours when the pool is open at least one lifeguard is on duty on the deck observing the pool if an individual is in the water and for every 50 individuals in the water; and requiring an owner of an indoor, heated, semipublic pool to ensure that during hours when the pool is open at least one lifeguard is on duty on the deck observing the pool if an individual is in the water and for every 50 individuals in the water.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/26/2021
Legislative Date
8/26/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Semipublic Pools - Lifeguards
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/26/2021 8/26/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Semipublic Pools - Lifeguards
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:48 PM
Click to return on the top page