Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Representation
Sponsored by
Senator Patterson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Apprenticeship and Training Council and consultants to the Council to include representation by individuals who are Black and Latino.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0726
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {667375/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Representation
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {667375/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Representation
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Economic Matters 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 12:28 PM
Click to return on the top page