Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2032, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/26/2020
Legislative Date
9/26/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/26/2020 9/26/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Sunset Extension
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable Adopted 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Second Reading Passed 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Sunset Extension
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 6 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 7 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Returned Passed 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Text - Chapter - State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Sunset Extension
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:26 PM
Click to return on the top page