Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to adopt certain rules and regulations applicable to certain reinsurance arrangements; limiting the application of the rules and regulations to certain reinsurance; providing that the rules and regulations may require a certain insurer to use the manual adopted by the National Association of Insurance Commissioners for a certain purpose; and prohibiting the regulations from applying to certain cessions to certain assuming insurers.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/29/2020
Legislative Date
9/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/29/2020 9/29/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Favorable Adopted 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Second Reading Passed 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 8 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Returned Passed 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page