Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of the Environment - Office of Recycling - Recycling Market Development
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, West, and Hester
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Recycling in the Department of the Environment to promote the development of markets for recycled materials and recycled products in the State; requiring the Office to evaluate the availability of certain markets and identify businesses in the State that use recycled materials; requiring that the annual Maryland solid waste management and diversion report be submitted to the General Assembly by September 1, 2022, and each year thereafter, and include certain activities; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0164
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2020
Legislative Date
10/05/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {434039/1 Adopted
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-4)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/05/2020 10/05/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments {434039/1 Adopted 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of the Environment - Office of Recycling - Recycling Market Development
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 7 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (131-4) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Last Updated: 5/18/2021 5:25 PM
Click to return on the top page