Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
False Claims - Civil Penalties or Damages - Authorization to Recover and Exceptions to General Fund Deposit by Comptroller
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 609
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a governmental entity to recover certain court costs and attorney's fees for certain actions; requiring that the Comptroller deposit civil penalties or damages collected by the State under the Maryland False Claims Act or other provisions of law prohibiting false claims against State health plans and health programs into certain funds or special funds rather than the General Fund of the State; establishing a False Claims Fund to be used by the Attorney General to investigate and litigate suspected violations of the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0391
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/27/2021
Legislative Date
9/27/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983129/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {313121/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 609
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/27/2021 9/27/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - False Claims - Civil Penalties or Damages - Exceptions to General Fund Deposit by Comptroller
Senate 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {983129/1 Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - False Claims - Civil Penalties or Damages - Authorization to Recover and Exceptions to General Fund Deposit by Comptroller
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Appropriations 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2022 3/13/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {313121/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - False Claims - Civil Penalties or Damages - Authorization to Recover and Exceptions to General Fund Deposit by Comptroller
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 609
Text - Chapter - False Claims - Civil Penalties or Damages - Authorization to Recover and Exceptions to General Fund Deposit by Comptroller
Last Updated: 7/26/2022 11:41 AM
Click to return on the top page