Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Licensing – Good Standing With the State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Requirement
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Assessments and Taxation)
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (92-42)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, before certain licenses or permits are issued or renewed, the issuing authority to verify with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation that the applicant is in good standing with the Department if the applicant is a person required to file an annual report under § 11-101 of the Tax - Property Article.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/29/2020
Legislative Date
9/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {737972/1 Adopted
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {596485/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {243623/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (50-85)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-42)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/29/2020 9/29/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Licensing – Good Standing With the State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Requirement
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {737972/1 Adopted 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Licensing – Good Standing With the State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Requirement
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 6 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 7 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments {596485/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Floor Amendment {243623/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (50-85) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (92-42) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 12:56 PM
Click to return on the top page