Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Purple Line Marketing Act
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration, in cooperation with certain stakeholders, to develop and implement a Purple Line marketing plan designed to generate early interest in and promote use of the Purple Line; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill $500,000 from the Transportation Trust Fund for the marketing plan in a certain fiscal year; requiring the Administration, by October 1, 2023, at the latest, to submit a certain report to certain standing committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/31/2020
Legislative Date
10/31/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Purple Line Marketing Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {707877/1
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {707877/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Purple Line Marketing Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-12)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {624367/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-41)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Purple Line Marketing Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/28/2021
Legislative Date
5/28/2021
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/31/2020 10/31/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Purple Line Marketing Act
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {707877/1 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {707877/1 Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Purple Line Marketing Act
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (33-12) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Appropriations Environment and Transportation 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {624367/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (98-41) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Purple Line Marketing Act
Post Passage 5/28/2021 5/28/2021 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 8/2/2021 12:10 PM
Click to return on the top page