Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Local Health District Boards
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing local health district boards in each local health planning agency; prohibiting certain funding for local health district boards from being included in certain local health services funding; requiring a local health planning agency to provide supplemental services approved by a local health district board; providing that local health district boards are independent units that operate within the local health planning agencies; providing for the purpose and duties of a local health district board; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health – Local Health District Boards
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Text - First - Public Health – Local Health District Boards
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:49 PM
Click to return on the top page